NY A00654 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - advanced to third reading cal.99
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals provisions relating to loitering for the purpose of engaging in a prostitution offense; makes technical corrections relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals provisions relating to loitering for the purpose of engaging in a prostitution offense; makes technical corrections relating thereto.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.99
2019-03-05Assemblyreported
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S02253 (Same As) 2019-01-23 - REFERRED TO CODES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback