NY A00648 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - substituted by s3421a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes care and services provided by licensed mental health practitioners eligible for coverage under the Medicaid program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes care and services provided by licensed mental health practitioners eligible for coverage under the Medicaid program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted by s3421a
2019-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.91
2019-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.91
2019-06-11Assemblyreported
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-07Assemblyprint number 648a
2019-05-07Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-01-23Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S03421 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00648&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00648&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00648
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00648&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00648A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00648&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00648&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00648&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback