NY A00629 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - advanced to third reading cal.274
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits any business from charging a price for goods of a substantially similar or like kind on the basis of a person's gender.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits any business from charging a price for goods of a substantially similar or like kind on the basis of a person's gender.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.274
2019-05-07Assemblyreported
2019-04-30Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

Same As/Similar To

S02679 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback