NY A00629 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - amended on third reading 629a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - amended on third reading 629a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits any business from charging a price for goods on the basis of a person's gender; civil penalties.
Title
Prohibits any business from charging a price for goods on the basis of a person's gender; civil penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Assembly | amended on third reading 629a |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.29 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.274 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S02679 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION