NY A00624 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - advanced to third reading cal.352
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - advanced to third reading cal.352
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of infant walkers and restricts the use of such infant walkers in certain settings.
Title
Prohibits the sale of infant walkers and restricts the use of such infant walkers in certain settings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.352 |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | print number 624c |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | print number 624b |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | print number 624a |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S02128 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION