NY A00623 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - substituted by s4347
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Restricts certain corporations from participating or intervening in any political campaign on behalf of or in opposition to any candidate for public office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restricts certain corporations from participating or intervening in any political campaign on behalf of or in opposition to any candidate for public office.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03Assemblysubstituted by s4347
2019-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.472
2019-05-30Assemblyreported
2019-05-07Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-01Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S01933 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S04347 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback