NY A00613 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - signed chap.9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the commissioner of the office of mental health to provide monthly status reports of the community investments and the impact on inpatient census to the chair of the senate finance committee and the chair of the assembly ways and means committee and to post such report on the office's website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the commissioner of the office of mental health to provide monthly status reports of the community investments and the impact on inpatient census to the chair of the senate finance committee and the chair of the assembly ways and means committee and to post such report on the office's website.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-03Assemblysigned chap.9
2023-03-03Assemblydelivered to governor
2023-02-01SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-02-01SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-02-01Senate3RD READING CAL.121
2023-02-01SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1354
2023-01-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2023-01-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-01-18Assemblypassed assembly
2023-01-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.22
2023-01-18Assemblyrules report cal.22
2023-01-18Assemblyreported
2023-01-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-01-18Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-01-10Assemblyreferred to mental health

Same As/Similar To

S01354 (Same As) 2023-02-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A613

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A613
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00613&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00613
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00613&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00613&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00613&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00613&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A613#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback