NY A00613 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s14a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Criminalizes the sale of ghost guns; requires gunsmiths to register and serialize firearms, rifles, shotguns, and unfinished frames or receivers they assemble.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminalizes the sale of ghost guns; requires gunsmiths to register and serialize firearms, rifles, shotguns, and unfinished frames or receivers they assemble.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07Assemblysubstituted by s14a
2021-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.409
2021-06-07Assemblyreported
2021-05-19Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-05-18Assemblyprint number 613a
2021-05-18Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2021-01-06Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S00014 (Same As) 2021-10-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.28

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback