NY A00611 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the voting age in New York be 16 years old.
Title
Provides that the voting age in New York be 16 years old.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2021-02-05 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2021-01-15 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S00478 (Same As) 2022-03-01 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY