NY A00603 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - substituted by s1338
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires notice to members of the legislature and certain local officials relating to certain construction and other projects affecting such members' and officials' districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires notice to members of the legislature and certain local officials relating to certain construction and other projects affecting such members' and officials' districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-15Assemblysubstituted by s1338
2023-02-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.90
2023-02-14Assemblyrules report cal.90
2023-02-14Assemblyreported
2023-02-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-01-09Assemblyreferred to cities

Same As/Similar To

S01338 (Same As) 2023-03-03 - SIGNED CHAP.98

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback