NY A00591 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-09 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-09 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of children and family services to track and report elder abuse and to issue a biennial report to the governor and legislature and office for the aging regarding the incidence of elder abuse in the state.
Title
Requires the office of children and family services to track and report elder abuse and to issue a biennial report to the governor and legislature and office for the aging regarding the incidence of elder abuse in the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-02-05 | Assembly | print number 591a |
2014-02-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to aging |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S02323 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - referred to codes