NY A00588 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - substituted by s8821a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - substituted by s8821a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing feminine hygiene products at no cost to individuals in correctional facilities and to any other individual in a punitive custodial setting.
Title
Relates to providing feminine hygiene products at no cost to individuals in correctional facilities and to any other individual in a punitive custodial setting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Assembly | substituted by s8821a |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | amended on third reading 588b |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2018-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.46 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.258 |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | reported |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-03-03 | Assembly | print number 588a |
2017-03-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S06176 (Same As) 2018-01-16 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S08672 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S08821 (Same As) 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.392
S08672 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S08821 (Same As) 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.392