NY A00587 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to gender balance on boards of state and local public authorities.
Title
Relates to gender balance on boards of state and local public authorities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | amended on third reading 587b |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.27 |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.218 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-26 | Assembly | print number 587a |
2019-04-26 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S02595 (Same As) 2020-08-03 - PRINT NUMBER 2595B