NY A00587 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-4)
Status: Passed on October 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-02 - signed chap.307
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires urine polymerase chain reaction testing for cytomegalovirus of newborns with hearing impairments; and directs the department of health to establish an education program for women who may become pregnant, expectant parents and parents of infants relating to various aspects of cytomegalovirus.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires urine polymerase chain reaction testing for cytomegalovirus of newborns with hearing impairments; and directs the department of health to establish an education program for women who may become pregnant, expectant parents and parents of infants relating to various aspects of cytomegalovirus.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-02Senatesigned chap.307
2018-09-20Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-04SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-04Senate3RD READING CAL.1230
2018-06-04SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2816B
2018-06-04SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-04Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-04Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.974
2018-05-30Assemblyreported
2018-03-13Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-03-05Assemblyprint number 587c
2018-03-05Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2018-01-08Assemblyprint number 587b
2018-01-08Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to health
2017-05-03Assemblyprint number 587a
2017-05-03Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to health
2017-01-09Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S02816 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A587C

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00587&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00587&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00587
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00587&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00587A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00587&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00587B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00587&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00587C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00587&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00587&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A587#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00587&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback