NY A00585 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - signed chap.585
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - signed chap.585
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires providers of voice service to implement the STIR/SHAKEN authentication framework in the internet protocol networks of voice service providers.
Title
Requires providers of voice service to implement the STIR/SHAKEN authentication framework in the internet protocol networks of voice service providers.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Asm. Monica Wallace [D] | Asm. Clyde Vanel [D] | Asm. Jenifer Rajkumar [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Assembly | signed chap.585 |
2021-10-27 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.849 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4281A |
2021-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | amended on third reading 585a |
2021-01-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.36 |
2021-01-20 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S04281 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A585A