NY A00585 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - substituted by s659a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "comprehensive contraception coverage act" to provide insurance coverage for FDA-approved contraceptive drugs, devices and products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "comprehensive contraception coverage act" to provide insurance coverage for FDA-approved contraceptive drugs, devices and products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-15 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22Assemblysubstituted by s659a
2019-01-17Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.8
2019-01-15Assemblyreported
2019-01-14Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-11Assemblyprint number 585a
2019-01-11Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to insurance
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S00659 (Same As) 2019-04-12 - SIGNED CHAP.25

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback