NY A00584 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.457
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.457
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the prohibition of discrimination based on an individual's or a dependent's reproductive health decision making.
Title
Relates to the prohibition of discrimination based on an individual's or a dependent's reproductive health decision making.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.457 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-01-22 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-01-22 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-01-22 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.7 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | substituted for a584 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.35 |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | substituted by s660 |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.7 |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S00660 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.457