NY A00581 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates a residential condominium owner bill of rights that includes the right to transparency, the right to timely decisions, voting rights, the right to notice, and the right against extraordinary expenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a residential condominium owner bill of rights that includes the right to transparency, the right to timely decisions, voting rights, the right to notice, and the right against extraordinary expenses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-30Assemblyenacting clause stricken
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to housing
2017-06-06Assemblyprint number 581a
2017-06-06Assemblyamend and recommit to housing
2017-01-09Assemblyreferred to housing

Same As/Similar To

S00510 (Same As) 2017-06-06 - PRINT NUMBER 510A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback