NY A00581 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - advanced to third reading cal.568
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits motor vehicle rental agencies from discriminating against a person because he or she does not have a major credit card.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits motor vehicle rental agencies from discriminating against a person because he or she does not have a major credit card.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-12Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.568
2016-05-10Assemblyreported
2016-01-06Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection
2015-01-07Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback