NY A00576 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-1)
Status: Passed on January 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-25 - signed chap.7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates as professional misconduct, engaging in sexual orientation change efforts by mental health care professionals upon patients under 18 years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates as professional misconduct, engaging in sexual orientation change efforts by mental health care professionals upon patients under 18 years of age.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-25Senatesigned chap.7
2019-01-15Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-01-15SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-01-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-01-15Senate3RD READING CAL.1
2019-01-15SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1046
2019-01-15SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-01-15Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-01-15Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.1
2019-01-14Assemblyrules report cal.1
2019-01-14Assemblyreported
2019-01-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-01-14Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S01046 (Same As) 2019-01-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A576

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00576&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00576&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00576
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00576&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00576&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00576&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A576#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00576&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback