NY A00574 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - ordered to third reading rules cal.318
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the retention of any amount of payment due and owing for materials delivered and accepted for a public or private construction project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the retention of any amount of payment due and owing for materials delivered and accepted for a public or private construction project.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.318
2019-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.318
2019-06-17Assemblyreported
2019-06-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-04Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S05498 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - REFERRED TO FINANCE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback