NY A00568 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a premium reduction for physicians and licensed midwives who complete a risk management strategies course in obstetrics or midwifery.
Title
Provides for a premium reduction for physicians and licensed midwives who complete a risk management strategies course in obstetrics or midwifery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-20 | Senate | vetoed memo.238 |
2019-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1378 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3158 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.320 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S03158 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - tabled