NY A00567 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 86-11)
Status: Passed on January 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-02 - APPROVAL MEMO.97
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 86-11)
Status: Passed on January 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-02 - APPROVAL MEMO.97
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "New York call center jobs act"; requires prior notice of relocation of call center jobs from New York to a foreign country; directs the commissioner of labor to maintain a list of employers who move call center jobs; prohibits loans or grants.
Title
Enacts the "New York call center jobs act"; requires prior notice of relocation of call center jobs from New York to a foreign country; directs the commissioner of labor to maintain a list of employers who move call center jobs; prohibits loans or grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-02 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.97 |
2020-01-02 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.752 |
2019-12-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.485 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted for a567c |
2019-03-12 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | AMENDED 1826C |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.225 |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 1826B |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-01 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 1826A |
2019-02-01 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2019-01-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s1826c |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.485 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.485 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-03-08 | Assembly | print number 567c |
2019-03-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | print number 567b |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | print number 567a |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S01826 (Same As) 2020-01-02 - APPROVAL MEMO.97