NY A00567 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 75-11)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - print number 567c
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "New York call center jobs act"; requires prior notice of relocation of call center jobs from New York to a foreign country; directs the commissioner of labor to maintain a list of employers who move call center jobs; prohibits loans or grants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "New York call center jobs act"; requires prior notice of relocation of call center jobs from New York to a foreign country; directs the commissioner of labor to maintain a list of employers who move call center jobs; prohibits loans or grants.

Sponsors

Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Amy Paulin [D]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]
Asm. Charles Barron [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Latrice Walker [D]
Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]
Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Sean Ryan [D]
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]
Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Andrew Raia [R]
Asm. Andrew Garbarino [R]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Diane Richardson [D]Asm. Steven Otis [D]
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Michael Cusick [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]
Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. David Buchwald [D]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]
Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]
Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]
Asm. Jaime Williams [D]Asm. Melissa Miller [R]Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Brian Miller [R]
Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Michael Norris [R]Asm. Maritza Davila [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]
Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]Asm. Patrick Burke [D]Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]
Asm. Charles Fall [D]Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]Asm. Steve Stern [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]
Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. Michael LiPetri [R]Asm. Michael Reilly [R]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]
Asm. Doug Smith [R]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Gary Pretlow [D]Asm. Karen McMahon [D]
Asm. Judy Griffin [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]
Asm. Brian Barnwell [D]Asm. Peter Abbate [D]Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R]Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]
Asm. Angelo Morinello [R]Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]
Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]Asm. David McDonough [R]Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Tremaine Wright [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08Assemblyprint number 567c
2019-03-08Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-03-05Assemblyprint number 567b
2019-03-05Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-01-24Assemblyprint number 567a
2019-01-24Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S01826 (Same As) 2019-03-12 - referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback