NY A00566 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the prohibition of discrimination based on an individual's or a dependent's reproductive health decision making.
Title
Relates to the prohibition of discrimination based on an individual's or a dependent's reproductive health decision making.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2018-03-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.44 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | amended on third reading 566a |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.88 |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S03791 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO INSURANCE