NY A00564 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of infant walkers; restricts the use of such infant walkers in certain settings.
Title
Prohibits the sale of infant walkers; restricts the use of such infant walkers in certain settings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.38 |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.286 |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | print number 564a |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S00111 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES