NY A00563 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-4)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - signed chap.503
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-4)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - signed chap.503
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain notices to be provided to customers at least forty-five days before such telephone corporation intends to change such customer's telephone service from copper-based telephone lines to fiber optic-based telephone lines.
Title
Requires certain notices to be provided to customers at least forty-five days before such telephone corporation intends to change such customer's telephone service from copper-based telephone lines to fiber optic-based telephone lines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-17 | Assembly | signed chap.503 |
2022-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1498 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3479A |
2022-03-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | amended on third reading 563a |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.37 |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.63 |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S03479 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A563A