NY A00558 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - ordered to third reading rules cal.143
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - ordered to third reading rules cal.143
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires non-preferential opportunity for use of amenities in certain buildings and apartments.
Title
Requires non-preferential opportunity for use of amenities in certain buildings and apartments.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Michael Miller [D] | Asm. Walter Mosley [D] |
Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Earlene Hooper [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Jose Rivera [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.143 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.143 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | print number 558a |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | referred to housing |