NY A00556 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - signed chap.408
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - signed chap.408
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the illegal taking of deer.
Title
Relates to the illegal taking of deer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-29 | Senate | signed chap.408 |
2017-11-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.852 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S387 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.131 |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | reported |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S00387 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A556