NY A00551 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a stay of issuance of a warrant for eviction for certain holdover tenants.
Title
Relates to a stay of issuance of a warrant for eviction for certain holdover tenants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to housing |