NY A00534 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-11 - print number 534b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that authorities having control of a fire department or fire company which provides emergency medical services may establish fees and charges for services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that authorities having control of a fire department or fire company which provides emergency medical services may establish fees and charges for services.

Sponsors

Asm. D. Billy Jones [D]Asm. Edward Ra [R]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]
Asm. David DiPietro [R]Asm. Kevin Byrne [R]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]
Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. Michael Norris [R]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]
Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Didi Barrett [D]
Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]Asm. Andrew Goodell [R]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]
Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Brian Miller [R]Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D]Asm. Karl Brabenec [R]
Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R]Asm. Patrick Burke [D]Asm. Mary Walsh [R]Asm. Michael Montesano [R]
Asm. Robert Smullen [R]Asm. Brian Manktelow [R]Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]Asm. Christopher Tague [R]
Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. John Mikulin [R]Asm. Stephen Hawley [R]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]
Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]Asm. Steve Stern [D]Asm. Aileen Gunther [D]
Asm. Karen McMahon [D]Asm. Jacob Ashby [R]Asm. John Salka [R]Asm. Judy Griffin [D]
Asm. Michael Durso [R]Asm. Matthew Simpson [R]Asm. Michael Lawler [R]Asm. Gina Sillitti [D]
Asm. Jarett Gandolfo [R]Asm. Jonathan Rivera [D]Asm. Jennifer Lunsford [D]Asm. Anna Kelles [D]
Asm. Christopher Burdick [D]Asm. Joseph Angelino [R]Asm. Joseph Giglio [R]Asm. Philip Ramos [D]
Asm. Michael Fitzpatrick [R]Asm. Taylor Darling [D]Asm. Keith Brown [R]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]
Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Doug Smith [R]Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]
Asm. Kenneth Burgos [D]Asm. Jaime Williams [D]Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D]Asm. Jodi Giglio [R]
Asm. Jeff Gallahan [R]Asm. Marjorie Byrnes [R]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Melissa Miller [R]

Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-11Assemblyprint number 534b
2022-02-11Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2022-01-05Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2021-06-04Assemblyprint number 534a
2021-06-04Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2021-05-25Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2021-01-06Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S01286 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
S07186 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback