NY A00530 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Note: Replaces legislation A00530
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s531b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s531b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the urban development corporation to conduct a study regarding the assistance needed to encourage women and minorities to pursue technology careers in science, technology, engineering and mathematics (STEM).
Title
Directs the urban development corporation to conduct a study regarding the assistance needed to encourage women and minorities to pursue technology careers in science, technology, engineering and mathematics (STEM).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s531b |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.520 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-14 | Assembly | print number 530b |
2021-05-14 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to economic development |
2021-02-05 | Assembly | print number 530a |
2021-02-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to economic development |