NY A00529 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-2)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - substituted by s6572
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides feminine hygiene products at no cost to menstruating individuals in homeless shelters, including, but not limited to, sanitary napkins, tampons and panty liners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides feminine hygiene products at no cost to menstruating individuals in homeless shelters, including, but not limited to, sanitary napkins, tampons and panty liners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-02Assemblysubstituted by s6572
2021-06-02Assemblyrules report cal.283
2021-06-02Assemblyreported
2021-05-25Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-05-04Assemblyprint number 529a
2021-05-04Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2021-02-23Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2021-01-06Assemblyreferred to social services

Same As/Similar To

S06572 (Same As) 2021-06-02 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A529
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00529&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00529
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00529&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00529A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00529&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00529&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00529&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments 750

feedback