NY A00528 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-11 - advanced to third reading cal.94
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the use of pesticides at children's overnight or summer day camps; provides an exception where emergency application is approved by local or state officials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the use of pesticides at children's overnight or summer day camps; provides an exception where emergency application is approved by local or state officials.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-11Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.94
2021-02-09Assemblyreported
2021-01-20Assemblyreported referred to codes
2021-01-06Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S04478 (Same As) 2021-02-24 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback