NY A00506 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 88-43)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - substituted by s7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - substituted by s7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the trafficking victims protection and justice act.
Title
Enacts the trafficking victims protection and justice act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Assembly | substituted by s7 |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.91 |
2015-03-11 | Assembly | reported |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00007 (Same As) 2015-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.368