NY A00502 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - substituted by s517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the constitution to delete the requirement that registration for purposes of voting be completed at least ten days before election day; provides that laws be made to adequately safeguard against deception in the exercise of the right of suffrage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends the constitution to delete the requirement that registration for purposes of voting be completed at least ten days before election day; provides that laws be made to adequately safeguard against deception in the exercise of the right of suffrage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Judiciary (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10Assemblysubstituted by s517
2021-05-06Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.285
2021-05-04Assemblyreported
2021-02-09Assemblyreported referred to judiciary
2021-02-01Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2021-01-12Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2021-01-06Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S00517 (Same As) 2021-05-12 - DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback