NY A00497 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - print number 497a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - print number 497a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the venison donation tax credit.
Title
Establishes the venison donation tax credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Assembly | print number 497a |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02128 (Same As) 2018-02-06 - PRINT NUMBER 2128A