NY A00492 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-27 - APPROVAL MEMO.92
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-27 - APPROVAL MEMO.92
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to policies or contracts which are not included in the definition of student accident and health insurance.
Title
Relates to policies or contracts which are not included in the definition of student accident and health insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-27 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.92 |
2019-12-27 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.746 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.440 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted for a492 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | referred to insurance |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.990 |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s6197 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.440 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.440 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reference changed to codes |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S01884 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S06197 (Same As) 2019-12-27 - APPROVAL MEMO.92
S06197 (Same As) 2019-12-27 - APPROVAL MEMO.92