NY A00484 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of health to develop informational materials concerning menstrual disorders for distribution in schools and to patients.
Title
Directs the commissioner of health to develop informational materials concerning menstrual disorders for distribution in schools and to patients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | signed chap.534 |
2019-11-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1454 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6368 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.318 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01016 (Same As) 2019-06-05 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S06368 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - signed chap.534
S06368 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - signed chap.534