NY A00474 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - signed chap.275
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - signed chap.275
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes social services districts to offer participants in public assistance employment programs an option to complete a course of instruction in financial literacy and personal finance; authorizes local social services districts to cooperate with the department of labor in providing workforce guidance and information.
Title
Authorizes social services districts to offer participants in public assistance employment programs an option to complete a course of instruction in financial literacy and personal finance; authorizes local social services districts to cooperate with the department of labor in providing workforce guidance and information.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. Jose Rivera [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-12 | Senate | signed chap.275 |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1849 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1170A |
2017-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.361 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.361 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | print number 474a |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to social services |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S01170 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A474A