NY A00472 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-21)
Status: Passed on August 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-10 - signed chap.490
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the commissioner of education to conduct a survey regarding instruction on the Holocaust within the state; provides a report shall be delivered which includes detailed results of the survey, the extent the survey data submitted was compliant with section eight hundred one of the education law, and if needed, recommendations to strengthen provisions of law if not compliant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the commissioner of education to conduct a survey regarding instruction on the Holocaust within the state; provides a report shall be delivered which includes detailed results of the survey, the extent the survey data submitted was compliant with section eight hundred one of the education law, and if needed, recommendations to strengthen provisions of law if not compliant.

Sponsors

Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Helene Weinstein [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Judy Griffin [D]
Asm. Simcha Eichenstein [D]Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]
Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]Asm. Michael Cusick [D]
Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Angelo Morinello [R]
Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]Asm. David McDonough [R]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]
Asm. Brian Miller [R]Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R]Asm. Michael Norris [R]Asm. Robert Smullen [R]
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Peter Abbate [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]
Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. David Weprin [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]
Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Doug Smith [R]Asm. Edward Ra [R]Asm. Kevin Byrne [R]
Asm. John Mikulin [R]Asm. Gina Sillitti [D]Asm. Brian Barnwell [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]
Asm. Amy Paulin [D]Asm. Michael Durso [R]Asm. Steve Stern [D]Asm. Karen McMahon [D]
Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Michael Montesano [R]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]
Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D]Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]
Asm. Michael Lawler [R]Asm. Michael Fitzpatrick [R]Asm. Philip Palmesano [R]Asm. Karl Brabenec [R]
Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. Manny De Los Santos [D]Asm. Anna Kelles [D]Asm. Colin Schmitt [R]
Asm. Keith Brown [R]Asm. Eric Brown [R]Asm. Jacob Ashby [R]Asm. Steven Otis [D]
Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Jenifer Rajkumar [D]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]Asm. John McDonald [D]
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Christopher Burdick [D]Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]
Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Jennifer Lunsford [D]Asm. William Conrad [D]Asm. Sarah Clark [D]
Asm. Didi Barrett [D]Asm. Christopher Tague [R]

Roll Calls

2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-08-10Assemblysigned chap.490
2022-08-09Assemblydelivered to governor
2022-05-25SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2022-05-25SenatePASSED SENATE
2022-05-25Senate3RD READING CAL.1417
2022-05-25SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S121B
2022-05-23SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2022-05-23Assemblydelivered to senate
2022-05-23Assemblypassed assembly
2022-05-23Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.281
2022-05-23Assemblyrules report cal.281
2022-05-23Assemblyreported
2022-05-09Assemblyreported referred to rules
2022-05-06Assemblyprint number 472c
2022-05-06Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2022-05-03Assemblyprint number 472b
2022-05-03Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2022-01-05Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2021-06-01Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-05-25Assemblyreference changed to ways and means
2021-05-20Assemblyprint number 472a
2021-05-20Assemblyamend and recommit to education
2021-01-06Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S00121 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A472C

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A472
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00472&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00472
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00472&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00472A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00472&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00472B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00472&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00472C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00472&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00472&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00472&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00472&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A472#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback