NY A00465 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - amended on third reading 465a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the definitions of pet dealers; decreases the number of animals a person can distribute to fit under the exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends the definitions of pet dealers; decreases the number of animals a person can distribute to fit under the exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19Assemblyamended on third reading 465a
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.40
2017-05-04Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.257
2017-05-02Assemblyreported
2017-04-25Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-04-25Assemblyreported referred to codes
2017-01-09Assemblyreferred to agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S05556 (Same As) 2018-03-07 - PRINT NUMBER 5556A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00465&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00465&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00465
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00465&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00465A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00465&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00465&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00465&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback