NY A00464 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "New York state teleworking expansion act"; provides that each state agency shall establish a policy and program to allow employees to perform all or a portion of their duties through teleworking to the maximum extent possible without diminished employee performance.
Title
Enacts the "New York state teleworking expansion act"; provides that each state agency shall establish a policy and program to allow employees to perform all or a portion of their duties through teleworking to the maximum extent possible without diminished employee performance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.32 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.518 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.518 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S00159 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS