NY A00435 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - substituted by s8638
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - substituted by s8638
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a proceeding challenging apportionment by the legislature shall be brought in certain designated courts in a judicial department within which at least one petitioner resides.
Title
Provides that a proceeding challenging apportionment by the legislature shall be brought in certain designated courts in a judicial department within which at least one petitioner resides.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Assembly | substituted by s8638 |
2024-02-28 | Assembly | rules report cal.15 |
2024-02-28 | Assembly | reported |
2024-02-28 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-02-23 | Assembly | print number 435b |
2024-02-23 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | print number 435a |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-01-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S08638 (Same As) 2024-02-28 - SIGNED CHAP.91