NY A00433 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-14 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-14 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes conforming technical changes to the New York City administrative code and the emergency tenant protection act relating to vacancy decontrol.
Title
Makes conforming technical changes to the New York City administrative code and the emergency tenant protection act relating to vacancy decontrol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.37 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.482 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S03482 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT