NY A00405 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Brendan's law"; requires child day care centers, public institutions for children and certain other facilities installing new or replacement window coverings to install cordless window coverings; requires child day care centers, public institutions for children and certain other facilities that have window coverings in place before the effective date of this section to meet safety standards established in ANSI/WCMA A 100.1-2012 or any successor standard.
Title
Establishes "Brendan's law"; requires child day care centers, public institutions for children and certain other facilities installing new or replacement window coverings to install cordless window coverings; requires child day care centers, public institutions for children and certain other facilities that have window coverings in place before the effective date of this section to meet safety standards established in ANSI/WCMA A 100.1-2012 or any successor standard.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.281 |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | print number 405a |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to children and families |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to children and families |