NY A00398 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on October 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - signed chap.290
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to ALS (Amyotrophic Lateral Sclerosis) research and education; creates the New York ALS research and education fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to ALS (Amyotrophic Lateral Sclerosis) research and education; creates the New York ALS research and education fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-01Senatesigned chap.290
2018-09-19Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-04Senate3RD READING CAL.1514
2018-06-04SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8582
2018-04-30SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2018-04-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-04-30Assemblypassed assembly
2018-04-16Assemblyamended on third reading 398a
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.36
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-05-17SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2017-05-17Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-05-17Assemblypassed assembly
2017-05-11Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.314
2017-05-09Assemblyreported
2017-01-09Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S01474 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
S08582 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A398A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00398&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00398&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00398
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00398&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00398A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00398&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00398&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A398#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback