NY A00391 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes bonus in the definition of wages for purposes of the labor law when the formula under which a bonus is determined is available to the employer or when the amount of a bonus has been declared; relates to the forfeit of wages.
Title
Includes bonus in the definition of wages for purposes of the labor law when the formula under which a bonus is determined is available to the employer or when the amount of a bonus has been declared; relates to the forfeit of wages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | held for consideration in labor |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S07254 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - REFERRED TO LABOR