NY A00382 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - approval memo.98
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - approval memo.98
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the creation, operation, and duties of natural organic reduction facilities as cemetery corporations for the contained, accelerated conversion of human remains to soil.
Title
Provides for the creation, operation, and duties of natural organic reduction facilities as cemetery corporations for the contained, accelerated conversion of human remains to soil.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-30 | Assembly | approval memo.98 |
2022-12-30 | Assembly | signed chap.817 |
2022-12-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1189 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5535 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.29 |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.92 |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S05535 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A382