NY A00381 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-09 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-09 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires any person, firm, partnership, association, limited liability company, corporation, or other entity that sells new motor vehicle child restraint systems to also sell motor vehicle child restraint system warning devices.
Title
Requires any person, firm, partnership, association, limited liability company, corporation, or other entity that sells new motor vehicle child restraint systems to also sell motor vehicle child restraint system warning devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-09 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-12-09 | Assembly | vetoed memo.86 |
2022-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1351 |
2022-05-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S300A |
2022-03-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.28 |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.219 |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | reported |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | print number 381a |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S00300 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A381A